Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 05/19/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 05/19/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/16/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/16/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/16/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/16/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/30/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/30/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/30/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/11/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/11/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/11/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/11/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/11/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/11/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/11/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/11/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/11/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/11/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/11/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/11/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/11/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/11/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/11/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/11/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/11/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/12/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/12/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/12/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/12/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/12/2005