Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/24/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/15/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/16/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/07/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/07/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/15/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/15/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/16/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/16/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/16/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/16/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/19/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/19/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/23/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/25/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/14/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/19/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/19/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/12/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/12/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/12/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/12/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/12/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/13/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/18/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/19/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/20/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 07/20/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/14/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/14/2006