Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/08/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/08/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/13/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/20/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/11/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/22/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/06/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/06/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/10/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/25/2006