Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/14/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/14/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/14/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 06/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 06/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 06/14/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/17/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/17/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/17/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/17/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/17/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/17/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/23/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/23/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/23/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/23/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/11/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/11/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/11/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/11/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/11/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/11/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/18/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/18/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/18/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/18/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/18/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/18/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/18/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/18/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/18/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/18/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/18/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/18/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/18/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/18/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/18/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/26/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/26/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/26/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/28/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/07/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/07/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/15/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/15/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/15/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/15/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/15/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/15/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/15/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/15/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/15/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/15/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/15/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/15/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/15/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/15/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/15/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/15/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/15/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/15/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/20/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/29/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/07/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/28/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/29/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/27/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/27/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/27/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/11/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/16/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/06/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/06/2006