Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 06/16/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 06/16/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/16/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/20/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/22/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/23/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/23/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/23/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/23/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/24/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/27/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/28/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/28/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/28/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/29/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/29/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/29/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/12/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/14/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/14/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/18/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/19/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/26/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/27/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/27/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/27/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/27/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/28/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/06/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/13/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/14/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/14/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/15/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/26/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/15/2005