Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/16/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/26/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/28/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/28/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/28/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/28/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/28/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/28/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/28/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/28/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/28/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/28/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/28/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/29/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/09/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/30/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/30/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/30/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/02/2006