Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 06/17/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/17/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/17/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/18/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/18/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/18/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/18/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/18/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/18/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/18/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/18/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/18/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 07/18/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/18/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/18/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/20/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/20/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/22/2005