Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/24/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 06/24/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 06/24/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 06/24/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 06/24/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/24/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/24/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/24/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 06/24/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/24/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/24/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 06/24/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 06/24/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 06/24/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/27/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/27/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/27/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/28/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/28/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/28/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/28/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/28/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/28/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/28/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/28/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/28/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/28/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/28/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/29/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/29/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/29/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/29/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/29/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/29/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/29/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/29/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/29/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 06/29/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/29/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/29/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/29/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/29/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/29/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/29/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/29/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/29/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/29/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/30/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/30/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/30/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/30/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/30/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/30/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/30/2005