Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 07/12/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/14/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/14/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/14/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/14/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/14/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/14/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 07/14/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/14/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/14/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/14/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/14/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/18/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/18/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/18/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/19/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/19/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/19/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/19/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/19/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/19/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/19/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/19/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 07/19/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/19/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/19/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/19/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 07/19/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/22/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/22/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/22/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/14/2006