Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 07/14/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/21/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/21/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/21/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/21/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/21/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/22/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/22/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/22/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/22/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/22/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/25/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/26/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/01/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/01/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/16/2006