There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Congratulating the State of Israel on the election of Ambassador Dan Gillerman as Vice-President of the 60th United Nations General Assembly.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/27/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 550).(text: CR 10/26/2005 H9202-9203)
07/19/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
10/27/2005-1:26pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/27/2005-1:26pmOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 0 (Roll no. 550). (text: CR 10/26/2005 H9202-9203)
10/27/2005-1:17pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9310)
10/26/2005-6:36pmAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed until Oct. 27.
10/26/2005-6:23pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 368.
10/26/2005-6:23pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9202-9204)
10/26/2005-6:22pmMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
10/07/2005Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
10/07/2005Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/19/2005Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
07/19/2005Introduced in House

Cosponsors (80)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/22/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/22/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/22/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/22/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/22/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/22/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/22/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/22/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/22/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/22/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/22/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/22/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/22/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/22/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/22/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/22/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/22/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/22/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/22/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/22/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/22/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/22/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/22/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/22/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/22/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/22/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/25/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/25/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/25/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/25/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/07/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/07/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/07/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/13/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/13/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/15/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/15/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/29/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/06/2005

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations07/19/2005 Referred to
10/07/2005 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.Res.368.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.368. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/27/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Congratulates Ambassador Dan Gillerman, Israel's Permanent Representative to the United Nations, and the government and people of Israel on Israel's election as Vice President of the 60th General Assembly of the United Nations.

Welcomes the nomination by the Western European and Others Group (WEOG), and the election by the General Assembly, of Israel as Vice President of the 60th United Nations General Assembly.

Supports continued expansion of Israel's U.N. role.

Notes that Israel: (1) remains the object of vilification by many U.N. members; and (2) remains excluded from the U.N. Asian regional grouping.

Calls upon U.N. Secretary-General Kofi Annan to work to end Israel's vilification at the United Nations and to use his good offices to support Israel's bid to join the Asian regional grouping.