Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/21/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/21/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/22/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/25/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/25/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/26/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/27/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/27/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/28/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/02/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/02/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/02/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/02/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/02/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/02/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/02/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/02/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/02/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/02/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/02/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/02/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/02/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/02/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/02/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/02/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/02/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/02/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/02/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/07/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/07/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/13/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/13/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/13/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/13/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/13/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/14/2005