Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/06/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/01/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 02/01/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/01/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/01/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/01/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/01/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/01/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/01/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/02/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/02/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/02/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/02/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/02/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/02/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/02/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/08/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/08/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/08/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/15/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/19/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/19/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/14/2005