Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/28/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 07/28/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/13/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/13/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/13/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/13/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/15/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/21/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/21/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/21/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/21/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/09/2005