There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Directing the Secretary of State to transmit to the House of Representatives not later than 14 days after the date of the adoption of this resolution documents in the possession of the Secretary of State relating to the disclosure of the identity and employment of Ms. Valerie Plame.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/16/2005Reported adversely by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 109-225.
07/29/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
09/16/2005Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 89.
09/16/2005Reported adversely by the Committee on International Relations. H. Rept. 109-225.
09/14/2005Ordered to be Reported Adversely by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 21.
09/14/2005Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/29/2005Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
07/29/2005Introduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations07/29/2005 Referred to
09/14/2005 Markup by
09/16/2005 Reported by H. Rept. 109-225

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Res.419. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (09/16/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Directs the Secretary of State to transmit to the House of Representatives all documents in the Secretary's possession relating to the disclosure of the identity of Ms. Valerie Plame as an employee of the Central Intelligence Agency (CIA) during May 6, 2003 - July 31, 2003.