Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/20/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/20/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/20/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/20/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/20/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/22/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/22/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/28/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/28/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/28/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/28/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/28/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/28/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/28/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/28/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/28/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/29/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/29/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/29/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/29/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/26/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 10/26/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/28/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/28/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/28/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/28/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/28/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/28/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/01/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 11/01/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/01/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/01/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/01/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/01/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/01/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/01/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/01/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/03/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/03/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/03/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/15/2005