Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/01/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/01/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/01/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/01/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/01/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/01/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/09/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/09/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/09/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/14/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/14/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 11/14/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/14/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/14/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/14/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/14/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/14/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/14/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/14/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/14/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/16/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/16/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/16/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/16/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/06/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/06/2005