Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/22/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 09/22/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/22/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/27/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/27/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/27/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/27/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/06/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/06/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/06/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/06/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/06/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/06/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/17/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/17/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/17/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/17/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 10/20/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/25/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/26/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/27/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/27/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/28/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/28/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/28/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/28/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/01/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/01/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/01/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/01/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/01/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/01/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/01/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/01/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/01/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/01/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/02/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/08/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/16/2005