Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 10/18/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/01/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/17/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/07/2005