Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 09/29/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/06/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/06/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/06/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/06/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/06/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/07/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/07/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/17/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/03/2005