Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 10/24/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/26/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/26/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/27/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/27/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/27/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/27/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/27/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/27/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/31/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/31/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 12/13/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/14/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/14/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/14/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/14/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/14/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/14/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/14/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 12/14/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/14/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/14/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/14/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/14/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/14/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/14/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/14/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/14/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/14/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/14/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 12/14/2005
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/14/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/14/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/14/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/14/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/14/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 12/14/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/14/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/14/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/14/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/14/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/15/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/15/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/15/2005