Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 10/07/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/18/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/18/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/18/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/18/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/18/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/18/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/18/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/18/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/25/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/25/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/25/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/25/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/25/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/25/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/25/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/25/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/28/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/28/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/28/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/28/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/03/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 11/03/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/03/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 11/03/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/03/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 11/04/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/04/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/15/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/15/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 11/15/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/15/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/16/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/16/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/16/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/16/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 11/16/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/16/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/16/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 11/16/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/18/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/18/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/13/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/13/2005