Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/18/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/18/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/18/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/18/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/18/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/18/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/18/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/25/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 10/25/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/25/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/25/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/28/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/28/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/28/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/28/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/28/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/28/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/28/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/28/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/28/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/28/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/28/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/28/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/28/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/28/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/28/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/02/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/02/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/02/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/02/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/02/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/02/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/02/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/02/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/02/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/02/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/02/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/02/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/02/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/02/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/04/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/04/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 11/04/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 12/06/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/06/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/06/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/06/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 12/06/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/06/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/31/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/31/2006