Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 12/15/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 12/15/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/15/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/15/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/15/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/15/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/15/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/15/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/15/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/15/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/15/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 12/15/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/15/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/01/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/01/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/01/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/01/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/28/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/28/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/28/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/28/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/28/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/28/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/09/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/09/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/17/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/24/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/07/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/28/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/12/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/12/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/19/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/20/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/20/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/28/2006