Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/01/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 11/07/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/10/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 11/16/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/16/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/07/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 12/07/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/07/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/01/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/01/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/08/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/15/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 02/15/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/01/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/01/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/01/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/01/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/01/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/09/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/09/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/15/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/29/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/29/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/06/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/06/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/06/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/25/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/25/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/25/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/03/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/03/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/03/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/04/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/09/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/18/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/18/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/28/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/28/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/13/2006