Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 10/25/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/28/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/28/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/28/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/28/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/28/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/28/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/28/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/28/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/28/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/28/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/28/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/02/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/02/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/02/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/02/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/02/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/02/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 11/02/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/07/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/07/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/07/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/07/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/07/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/07/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/07/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/07/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/07/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 11/07/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 11/07/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/07/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/07/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 11/18/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 11/18/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/18/2005