Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 10/26/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/27/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/27/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/27/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/01/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/01/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/01/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 11/01/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 11/01/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/02/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/02/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/02/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/03/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/03/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 11/03/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 11/09/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 11/09/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/10/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/10/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/15/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/18/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/18/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/06/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/06/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/06/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/06/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/06/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/06/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/06/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 12/06/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/06/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/08/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 12/16/2005