Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/26/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/08/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/04/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/04/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/16/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/19/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/25/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/25/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/07/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/07/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/13/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/13/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/13/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/28/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/29/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/29/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 12/05/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/05/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/05/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 12/05/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/05/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/05/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/06/2006
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 12/06/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/07/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/08/2006