Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 10/27/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/16/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/08/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 12/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/14/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/14/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/14/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/15/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/15/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/16/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/16/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/16/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/16/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/16/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/16/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/16/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/16/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/16/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/17/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/17/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/01/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/08/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/14/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/14/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/16/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/16/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/16/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/16/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/16/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/16/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/16/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/16/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/01/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/02/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/02/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/16/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/30/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/25/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/25/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/03/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/09/2006