Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/28/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/02/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/09/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/10/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/10/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/15/2005