Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 11/02/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/15/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/15/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 11/15/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/15/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/15/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/15/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/15/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/15/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/15/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/16/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 11/16/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/16/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/16/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/16/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/16/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/16/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/16/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/16/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/16/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 12/08/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/13/2005