Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/04/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 11/04/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 11/04/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 11/04/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 11/04/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/04/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/08/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/08/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/08/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/08/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/08/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/08/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/08/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/08/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/08/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/08/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/08/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/08/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 11/08/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/08/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/08/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/08/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/08/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/08/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 11/08/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 11/08/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/15/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/15/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/15/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/15/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/16/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/16/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/06/2005