Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/09/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 11/09/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/14/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/14/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/13/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/16/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/16/2006