Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 11/16/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 11/16/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/17/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/07/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/31/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/31/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 01/31/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 01/31/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/31/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/31/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/01/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/01/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/07/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 02/07/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/07/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/07/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/07/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/07/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/08/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/08/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/14/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/04/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/04/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/04/2006