Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 11/17/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/07/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 12/07/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/07/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/07/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/07/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/07/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 12/07/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/07/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/07/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/07/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/07/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/07/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/07/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/07/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/07/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/07/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/13/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/13/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/01/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/15/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/15/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/15/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/01/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/01/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/01/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/01/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/07/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/07/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/05/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/10/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/06/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/06/2006