Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 11/18/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 11/18/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 12/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 12/06/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/06/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 12/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/06/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 12/06/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/06/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 12/06/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/06/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/06/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/06/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/06/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/06/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/06/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 12/06/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 12/06/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 12/06/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/06/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/06/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/06/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/06/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 12/06/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/06/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 12/06/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 12/06/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/08/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 12/08/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/08/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/08/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 12/08/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/08/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 12/08/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/08/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/08/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/08/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 12/08/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/08/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/08/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/08/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/08/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/08/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 12/08/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/08/2005
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 12/08/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 12/08/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/13/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 12/13/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/13/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/13/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/13/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 12/13/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/13/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 12/13/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/13/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/13/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/13/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/13/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/13/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 12/13/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/13/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/13/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/14/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 12/14/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/14/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 12/14/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/14/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 12/14/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/14/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 12/14/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/14/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/14/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/14/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/15/2005