Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 12/07/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 02/15/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/15/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/28/2006