Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/15/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/15/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/15/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/15/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/15/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 12/15/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/15/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/01/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/01/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/01/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/01/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/08/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/08/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/16/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/16/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/16/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/28/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/29/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/30/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/30/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/30/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/30/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/30/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/30/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/30/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/30/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/30/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/30/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/04/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/04/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/04/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/04/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/04/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/04/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/04/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/04/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/25/2006