Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 12/14/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 12/14/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/15/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 12/15/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 12/15/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 12/15/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/15/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 12/15/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/15/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/15/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/15/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/16/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/16/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 12/16/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 12/16/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 12/16/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/18/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/01/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/01/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/01/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/01/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/01/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/01/2006