Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 12/15/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 12/15/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/15/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/15/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/15/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 12/15/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/15/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 12/15/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/15/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/15/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/15/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 12/15/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/15/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 12/15/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/15/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/15/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 12/16/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/17/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/22/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/28/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/29/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/29/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/20/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/12/2006
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/12/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/12/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/12/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/12/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/12/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/12/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/12/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/12/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/12/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/12/2006
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/12/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/12/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/12/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/13/2006