Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/08/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/08/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/08/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/08/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/08/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/08/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/08/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/15/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/07/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/07/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/07/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/07/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/07/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/07/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/07/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/07/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/14/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/14/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/14/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/14/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/04/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/24/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/25/2006