Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/27/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/27/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/27/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/07/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/07/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/07/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/07/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/07/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/07/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/07/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/07/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/12/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/12/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/12/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/12/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/12/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/13/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/13/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/13/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/19/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/19/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/19/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/19/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/19/2006