Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/28/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/28/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/28/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 02/28/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/28/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/28/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/28/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/28/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/28/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/28/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/28/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/28/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/28/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/28/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/28/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/28/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/28/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/28/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/28/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/13/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/13/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/13/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/13/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/13/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/13/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/13/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/25/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/25/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/27/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/03/2006