Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 01/03/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 01/03/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 02/07/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/07/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/07/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/07/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/07/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 02/07/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/07/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/07/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 02/07/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/07/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/07/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/07/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 02/07/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/07/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/15/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/15/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/15/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/15/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/15/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/14/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/12/2006