Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/02/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/09/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/09/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/09/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/09/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/09/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/09/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/15/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/15/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/02/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/02/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/02/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/02/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/02/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/16/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/16/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/16/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/16/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/16/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/16/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/16/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/16/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/16/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/16/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/16/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/17/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/17/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/17/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/17/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/17/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/17/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/17/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/17/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/05/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/05/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/18/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/18/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/18/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/18/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/18/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/18/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/18/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/26/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/26/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/28/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/28/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/28/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/28/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/11/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/23/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/28/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/11/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/25/2006