Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/15/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/15/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/28/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/28/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/28/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/28/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/28/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/28/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/28/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/01/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/01/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/01/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/01/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/07/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/07/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/08/2006