There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing disapproval of the Arab League's decision to hold its 2006 summit in Khartoum, Sudan and calling on the Arab League, the Government of Sudan, the Sudanese rebels, and the world community to do all they can to end acts of genocide in the Darfur region of Sudan.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
04/05/2006Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1474)
02/28/2006Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Unanimous Consent.
02/28/2006Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/27/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Human Rights and International Operations.
02/14/2006Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
02/14/2006Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H243)
02/14/2006Introduced in House

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/14/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/14/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/14/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/14/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/16/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/16/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/16/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/28/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/09/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/14/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/14/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/14/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/14/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/05/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/02/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations02/14/2006 Referred to
House International Relations Subcommittee on Africa, Global Human Rights and International Operations02/27/2006 Referred to
02/28/2006 Markup by
02/28/2006 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.Res.675.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.675. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2006)

Disapproves of the Arab League's decision to hold its 2006 summit in Khartoum, Sudan.

Calls on the Arab League, the government of Sudan, the Sudanese rebels, and the world community to do all they can to end the acts of genocide in the Darfur region of Sudan.