Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/14/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/14/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/14/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/14/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/16/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/16/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/16/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/28/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/09/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/14/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/14/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/14/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/14/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/05/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/02/2006