Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/28/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/28/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/05/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/05/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/05/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/05/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/26/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/26/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/26/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/26/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/26/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/03/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/03/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/24/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/24/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/24/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/07/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/12/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/12/2006