There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Amending the Rules of the House of Representatives to curtail the growth of Government programs.

Actions Overview (1)

02/16/2006 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

04/06/2006 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1633)
02/16/2006 Referred to the House Committee on Rules.
02/16/2006 Introduced in House

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 02/16/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/16/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/01/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/01/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/01/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/08/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/03/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/03/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/23/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/29/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Rules02/16/2006 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Res.690.

Subjects (8)

  • Government spending reductions
  • House rules and procedure
  • Legislation
  • Legislative amendments
  • Legislative resolutions
  • Waste in government spending

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Res.690. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/16/2006)

Amends rule XXI (Restrictions on Certain Bills) of the Rules of the House of Representatives to provide that it shall not be in order to consider a bill, joint resolution, amendment, or conference report that establishes a new program or modifies an existing program by adding a new function unless such legislation also eliminates one or more existing programs of equal or greater total cost. Excludes legislation that establishes a new defense, homeland security, or emergency program.